U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Suarez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 07, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 04, 2016: [Exhibit]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 28, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 21, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Status Conference]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 22, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 22, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 22, 2015: [Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order]
  • October 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 09, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.