U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spicer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 07, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 27, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 27, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.