U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00247-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eason
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • April 11, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Letter]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 21, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 13, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • October 13, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 13, 2015: [Bond]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 09, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 09, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 09, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 09, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 07, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.