U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bookhardt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 22, 2020: [Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 20, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 13, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 06, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 06, 2020: [Violation Report]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 21, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.