U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sealed Document]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Dismiss ]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam ]
  • February 03, 2016: [Psychiatric Exam]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 19, 2016: [Violation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam ]
  • November 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 12, 2015: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 10, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 10, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 06, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2015: [Transfer In/Probationer]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 08, 2015: [Add Counts]
  • October 08, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.