U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00249-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swinton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 05, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 27, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 27, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • September 22, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 17, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • November 13, 2015: [Remark]
  • November 13, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 13, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • November 12, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 08, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.