U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Viola
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Passport Returned]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 27, 2020: [Seal]
  • February 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 10, 2018: [Seal]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Transfer / Disqualify / Recuse Judge]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Transfer / Disqualify / Recuse Judge]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [2255 Motion Filed]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [USCA Appeal Fees]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • November 25, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • November 16, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • November 10, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 10, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 10, 2015: [Seal]
  • November 10, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.