U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mantoura
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 16, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 09, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 18, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 13, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • October 13, 2015: [Bond]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 13, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 13, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 13, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 13, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.