U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ross
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Conference]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order]
  • June 28, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • June 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • May 06, 2016: [Conference]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 05, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 01, 2016: [Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 26, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 25, 2016: [Letter]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 24, 2016: [Letter]
  • January 20, 2016: [Letter]
  • January 19, 2016: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.