U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mead
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 23, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 22, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Seal]
  • June 06, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 02, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Restitution Order Deadline]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2016: [Court Exhibits]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 17, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 15, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • January 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 07, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 14, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 14, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 14, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 14, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.