U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leigh-James
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • July 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 18, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 18, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 18, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 07, 2020: [Continue ]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 21, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 28, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 18, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Transcript]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 25, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 25, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Transcript]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 21, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 25, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 27, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 06, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 06, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2016: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • June 01, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • June 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Conference]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Conference]
  • May 31, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 31, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 07, 2016: [Witness List]
  • April 07, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 07, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • March 30, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Bond]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 20, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.