U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00186-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dobrozensky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Seal]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 10, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Waiver of Sentencing Time]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 15, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 15, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 15, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 15, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 15, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 15, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 15, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • October 15, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.