U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00189-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 06, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 03, 2020: [Violation Report]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Continue ]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 30, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • November 28, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • November 28, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 03, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 02, 2018: [Violation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 07, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 01, 2018: [Continue ]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 09, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 29, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 25, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 25, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 18, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 09, 2015: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • November 09, 2015: [Arrest - Other District]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.