U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • August 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 15, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 09, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 12, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 12, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • January 08, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 02, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Seal]
  • December 26, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • November 17, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Incur Expenses (Sealed)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • September 25, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Extension of Time]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 21, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Giglio Material]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 18, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • January 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 18, 2017: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 13, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order Referring Plea]
  • January 10, 2017: [Frye Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: [Extension of Time]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 14, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Giglio Material]
  • November 29, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • November 15, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • November 14, 2016: [Extension of Time]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Extension of Time]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 22, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • June 21, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 03, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 20, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 23, 2016: [Extension of Time]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • November 10, 2015: [ExParte Motion]
  • November 05, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 03, 2015: [Unseal Document]
  • November 02, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 29, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.