U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:01-cr-00230-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nieves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [USM Return Unexecuted]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 29, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order of Transfer]
  • June 21, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • June 03, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 01, 2021: [Application for Writ]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Writ Returned]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 16, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 16, 2017: [Application for Writ]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Writ Returned]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Writ Returned]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2016: [Seal]
  • June 14, 2016: [Application for Writ]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • October 16, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • October 16, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.