U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-00212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dudley, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 26, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 02, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Probable Cause Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 30, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • October 29, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 19, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 16, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 16, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 16, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 16, 2015: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.