U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marshall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 09, 2015: [Transcript]
  • December 02, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2015: [Extension of Time]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 16, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.