U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stevenson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 15, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 14, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 14, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 11, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 08, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 04, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 25, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 16, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 16, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 16, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.