U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rogers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 24, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 07, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 04, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 04, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 01, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Restitution Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 12, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 06, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 26, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2018: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 03, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 15, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 19, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 19, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 19, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 19, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 16, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 16, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 16, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 16, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 16, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.