U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pyles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 19, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 25, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 22, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 14, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 13, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: [Seal]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sealed Document]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 25, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2018: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Continue ]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 19, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 19, 2015: [Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.