U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00248-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGrath
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • November 17, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 17, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • November 16, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.