U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [USM Return Unexecuted]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Restitution Order Deadline]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 14, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order]
  • January 13, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 08, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 30, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 22, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 20, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 20, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 20, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • October 20, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 20, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 20, 2015: [Bond]
  • October 20, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.