U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Doran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 22, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2015: [Revocation of Probation Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • November 17, 2015: [Appear]
  • November 13, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 13, 2015: [Violation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 22, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 21, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.