U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manigault
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 13, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 10, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 10, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 06, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Transcript]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 25, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 22, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 12, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 02, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 23, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 22, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 22, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 22, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 22, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 22, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 22, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.