U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Copy]
  • April 10, 2017: [Copy]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 15, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 14, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 09, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 07, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 12, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • September 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 20, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2016: [Extension of Time]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 07, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Transcript]
  • March 04, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • March 04, 2016: [Witness List]
  • March 04, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 11, 2016: [Extension of Time]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 22, 2016: [Suppress]
  • January 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 06, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 06, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 03, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 30, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 25, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 25, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 13, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 13, 2015: [Seal]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 02, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 02, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2015: [Arrest ]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 29, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 26, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 22, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.