U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swinton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 10, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 08, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • March 08, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 17, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • January 25, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • January 25, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 22, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • January 22, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 21, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 20, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 12, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.