U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00302-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Wint et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Writ Returned]
  • February 18, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 21, 2016: [Seal]
  • January 21, 2016: [Application for Writ]
  • January 21, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.