U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00191-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 27, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • January 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 23, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 23, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 23, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 23, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 23, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 23, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 23, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.