U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00196-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Transcript]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 31, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 04, 2016: [Extension of Time]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 28, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 26, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 16, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2016: [Suppress]
  • May 24, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 23, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • May 10, 2016: [Approve Associate Counsel]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 21, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 12, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 12, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 12, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 09, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.