U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rizvi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 20, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 25, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 20, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 28, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 28, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 28, 2015: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • October 28, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.