U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tejeda et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 31, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 31, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 30, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 30, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • October 30, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 23, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 14, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 05, 2018: [Continue ]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 14, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • March 14, 2018: [Travel ]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 06, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Passport Returned]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 22, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 22, 2017: [Return of Passport]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 14, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • March 14, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 28, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 28, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 28, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 22, 2017: [Seal]
  • February 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 26, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 16, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • November 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam ]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 28, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 19, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 14, 2016: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2016: [Dismiss ]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 30, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 26, 2016: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • August 24, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 24, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 16, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 01, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
  • June 20, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • June 10, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 10, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 10, 2016: [Bond]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order]
  • April 01, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 18, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 10, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 07, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 20, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 05, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 05, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 05, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 28, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 28, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.