U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00198-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stanley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [2255 Motion Filed]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Restitution Order]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 04, 2019: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 15, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 15, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • November 15, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 09, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 02, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [New Trial]
  • July 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 14, 2017: [Acquittal]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Extension of Time]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Letter]
  • April 24, 2017: [Extension of Time]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 04, 2017: [Jury Instructions/Charge]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • December 22, 2016: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 22, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • December 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • December 16, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2016: [Acquittal]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • December 16, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • December 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • December 14, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • December 10, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 10, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • December 08, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • December 08, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • December 07, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 07, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • December 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 06, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • December 06, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 05, 2016: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • December 05, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • December 04, 2016: [Notice]
  • December 04, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 04, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 03, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 02, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 02, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 02, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 01, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 01, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 01, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • December 01, 2016: [Court Exhibits]
  • December 01, 2016: [Jury Selection]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • November 29, 2016: [Court Exhibits]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 29, 2016: [In Camera Hearing]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 29, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 29, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • November 29, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 29, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • November 28, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
  • November 28, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • November 28, 2016: [Quash ]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 26, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • November 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • November 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • November 17, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
  • November 15, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • November 14, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • November 14, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 14, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • November 08, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 17, 2016: [Extension of Time]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
  • May 16, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 09, 2016: [Discovery]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 14, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 11, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • November 04, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 03, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 03, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 03, 2015: [Arrest ]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 29, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 29, 2015: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • October 29, 2015: [Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.