U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00200-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benincasa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • February 22, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 21, 2017: [Disqualify / Recuse Counsel]
  • February 21, 2017: [Alter Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Clerk's Disbursement of Funds]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 30, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 11, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • November 20, 2015: [Travel ]
  • November 05, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2015: [Bond]
  • November 03, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 29, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 29, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 29, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 29, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 29, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 29, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 29, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.