U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benincasa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Transcript]
May, 2017
  • May 29, 2017: [Order on Miscelleneous Motion re Reduction of Sentence USSC Amendment]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 18, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Clerk's Disbursement of Funds]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 21, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 10, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2015: [Bond]
  • November 03, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 30, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 29, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 29, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 29, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 29, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 29, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 29, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • October 29, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 29, 2015: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.