U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Youmans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 28, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 28, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • January 27, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 26, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 22, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.