U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00203-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anate
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Transcript]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order Returning Submission]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • September 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 12, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 08, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Strike ]
  • May 31, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
  • May 31, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • May 31, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • May 23, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 01, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Suppress]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 24, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • March 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 14, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 10, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 10, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 01, 2016: [Reconsideration]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 11, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • February 11, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • February 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Suppress]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 20, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 01, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 13, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 13, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 13, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 13, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 13, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 10, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • November 04, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.