U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00087-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 19, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2018: [Seal]
  • January 18, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 16, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 16, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • January 02, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 02, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 05, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • November 27, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.