U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • January 10, 2023: [Return of Passport]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 02, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 31, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 14, 2022: [Seal]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Seal]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 28, 2021: [Seal]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 24, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 05, 2021: [Continue ]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 08, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 01, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • November 05, 2020: [Continue ]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • September 01, 2020: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • September 01, 2020: [Continue ]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 27, 2020: [Continue ]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Continue ]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 05, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continue ]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 24, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 24, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 15, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 10, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continue ]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 24, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 16, 2019: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • May 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 20, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Bond]
  • May 08, 2019: [Bond]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • May 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Continue ]
  • April 30, 2019: [Bond]
  • April 29, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 23, 2019: [Transcript]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 20, 2019: [Continue ]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 11, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2019: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • March 07, 2019: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 07, 2019: [Bond]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • March 07, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Continue ]
  • February 21, 2019: [Bond]
  • February 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • January 31, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 31, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 28, 2019: [Bond]
  • January 28, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 25, 2019: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • January 25, 2019: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • January 25, 2019: [Indictment]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 09, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 09, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.