U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luciano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 07, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 02, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Continue ]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Violation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 18, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 18, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 16, 2016: [Violation Report]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Continue ]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 11, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 10, 2016: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 06, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 06, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 04, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 04, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • August 04, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 03, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 03, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [Add Counts]
  • November 09, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 09, 2015: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.