U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rhoades
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 05, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 21, 2018: [Restitution Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • August 07, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 03, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 14, 2018: [Reconsideration]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • June 14, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 13, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 12, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 12, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 08, 2017: [Restitution Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 23, 2017: [Seal]
  • May 15, 2017: [Extension of Time]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 03, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 29, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 27, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 27, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 23, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 21, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 16, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 16, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • March 15, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • March 10, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 03, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Disqualify / Recuse Counsel]
  • September 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Disqualify / Recuse Counsel]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Instrument Returned]
  • July 20, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 18, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 18, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • July 12, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Suppress]
  • May 17, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 10, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 01, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 14, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 04, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 24, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 20, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 20, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 20, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 19, 2015: [Search Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 16, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 12, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.