U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis-Joyner et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • January 16, 2023: [Exoneration of Bond]
  • January 13, 2023: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • December 20, 2022: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • December 20, 2022: [Bond]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • December 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 14, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 20, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 06, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Witness List]
  • May 07, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 08, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Hearing ]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Restitution Order]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order Returning Submission]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Extension of Time]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 13, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • May 26, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 23, 2016: [Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 18, 2016: [Seal]
  • May 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 21, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • March 16, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • March 16, 2016: [Application for Writ]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 10, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2016: [Extension of Time]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 28, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 17, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 17, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 17, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 17, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.