U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:99-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villanueva
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 15, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 30, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Transcript]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order]
  • June 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 13, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • February 23, 2016: [Vacate ]
  • February 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [USCA Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.