U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gambardella
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 19, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 24, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 23, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 23, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 23, 2016: [Payment]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 08, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 15, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2016: [~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 11, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 11, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 19, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 19, 2015: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.