U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lambert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 08, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 16, 2015: [Court Exhibits]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 16, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • December 16, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 15, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • December 15, 2015: [Seal]
  • December 15, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 13, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 08, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 08, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • December 07, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.