U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gouldbourne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Transcript]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sentencing]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 28, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 28, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 27, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 17, 2015: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 17, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • December 17, 2015: [Consent Form]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 17, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 17, 2015: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 17, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • December 17, 2015: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 17, 2015: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.