U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eastman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Disclosure ]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Disclosure ]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 04, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • December 04, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 30, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 29, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 29, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • November 29, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 27, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 27, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 24, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Continue ]
  • October 17, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Continue ]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Continue ]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • May 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 03, 2017: [Sealed Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • April 19, 2017: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 25, 2017: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Sealed Document]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice]
  • September 12, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 08, 2016: [Continue ]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Disqualify / Recuse Counsel]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 22, 2016: [Disqualify / Recuse Counsel]
  • August 17, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 22, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • June 27, 2016: [Seal]
  • June 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 27, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 24, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • June 22, 2016: [Witness List]
  • June 22, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • June 10, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 12, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 09, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 22, 2016: [Suppress]
  • January 11, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.