U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larsen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Restitution Order]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 28, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 28, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 28, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 12, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 12, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 10, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Transcript]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Payment]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [Bond]
  • January 27, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • January 27, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 27, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2016: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • January 27, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 27, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.