U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wallace
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 17, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • February 14, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Transcript]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.