U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 28, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 09, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • December 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 17, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 17, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 12, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • September 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 16, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 24, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 24, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 25, 2016: [Continue ]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • January 29, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 28, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 28, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 28, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.