U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maleki et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 18, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [Writ Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 29, 2021: [Sealed Document]
June, 2020
  • June 28, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 28, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 02, 2020: [Seal]
  • March 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 16, 2019: [Seal]
  • August 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 06, 2019: [Seal]
  • March 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • November 10, 2018: [Seal]
  • November 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 18, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Restitution Order]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 01, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 16, 2017: [Seal]
  • August 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 29, 2017: [Seal]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Writ Returned]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 07, 2017: [Seal]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Writ Returned]
  • June 05, 2017: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 22, 2017: [Extension of Time]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • April 05, 2017: [Seal]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2017: [Application for Writ]
March, 2017
  • March 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sealed Order]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • February 08, 2017: [Exoneration of Bond]
  • February 03, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 01, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 01, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 31, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 31, 2017: [Exoneration of Bond]
  • January 30, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 30, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 26, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 20, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2017: [Continue ]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 13, 2016: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • December 13, 2016: [Search Warrant Issued ]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 06, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 02, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 30, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • November 30, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 29, 2016: [Travel ]
  • November 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 14, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 04, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 03, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 03, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 03, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 03, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 02, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 02, 2016: [Dismiss ]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 27, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • October 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 26, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 26, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 26, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 24, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 24, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 20, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 20, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • October 20, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 18, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 18, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 14, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 22, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 21, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 21, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 15, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 14, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 06, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • September 06, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 06, 2016: [Transcript]
  • September 01, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • September 01, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 26, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 25, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 24, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 24, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 22, 2016: [Seal]
  • August 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 18, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 17, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 02, 2016: [Transcript]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 26, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 14, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 14, 2016: [Seal]
  • July 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 14, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • July 14, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 14, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 14, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 14, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 13, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 13, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 13, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • July 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • July 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2016: [Seal]
  • July 12, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 24, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 24, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 12, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Joinder ]
  • May 11, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Conference]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 03, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Conference]
  • May 03, 2016: [Joinder ]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 27, 2016: [Conference]
  • April 27, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 21, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on ExParte Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 06, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 06, 2016: [ExParte Motion]
  • April 06, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 30, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 28, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 28, 2016: [Travel ]
  • March 24, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 24, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 24, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 23, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 23, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 22, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 16, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 16, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 09, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 09, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 07, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 07, 2016: [Frye Hearing]
  • March 02, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 25, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 25, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 25, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 23, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 19, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 19, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 19, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 18, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 18, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • February 08, 2016: [Travel ]
  • February 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • February 04, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • February 01, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 01, 2016: [Indictment Unsealed]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • January 29, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.